+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 84
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #361 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 52
- Absent: 4
March 25, 2021: House Vote #294 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 56
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 8