+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Act 435
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor