+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Act 335
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper