+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Postponed
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper