+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Act 344
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Prefiled