+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Act 78
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #297 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
March 16, 2021: House Vote #254 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 153
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 11