+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Act 479
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House Postponed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House Postponed
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper