+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper