+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 486
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Reconsidered
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Notice to Reconsider
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper