+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Act 434
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper