+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Act 432
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor