+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2022: Senate Vote #860 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2021: House Vote #229 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 169
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5