+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 204
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2021: House Vote #399 Agree Sen Sub
- Yeas: 166
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 5
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #352 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2021: House Vote #188 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 166
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 3