+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Act 430
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor