+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 72
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2021: Senate Vote #211 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2021: House Vote #160 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 155
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor