+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 359
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor