+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Act 173
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper