+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Reconsidered
- Senate Third Read Lost
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Engrossed
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor