+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper