+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 549
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Recommitted
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Tabled
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper