+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Notice to Reconsider
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper