+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Act 228
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2021: House Vote #413 Agree Sen Am as Am
- Yeas: 163
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 4
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #400 ADOPTION OF AMENDMENT #2 BY THE SENATOR FROM THE 46TH
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #401 PASSAGE AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #440 AGREE TO HOUSE AMENDMENT TO SENATE AMENDMENT
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2021: House Vote #207 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 171
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 4