+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 85
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor