+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 601
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2022: Senate Vote #515 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2021: House Vote #160 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 155
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 12