+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Veto V8
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor