+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Act 149
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor