+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Act 278
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2021: House Vote #443 Agree Sen Sub
- Yeas: 156
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 6
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #436 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #358 MOTION TO ENGROSS: HB 160, HB 333, HB 498, HB 574, HB 575, & HB 588
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 7
March 3, 2021: House Vote #154 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 164
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 11