+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 14
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper