+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Act 249
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor