+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Veto V7
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper