+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Third Read
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper