+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Act 113
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper