+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 118
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper