+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper