+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper