+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Act 317
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper