+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Veto V5
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper