+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper