+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 17, 2018 in the House:
- Act 3EX
- House Date Signed by Governor
- House Sent to Governor
On November 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On November 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On November 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Second Readers
On November 13, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper