+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 580
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Second Readers
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper