+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Act 234
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper