+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 112
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor