+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Effective Date
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 290
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Taken from Table
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Reconsidered
- House Tabled
- House Tabled
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Notice to Reconsider
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper