+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Hopper