+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 84
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper