+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper