+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 443
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Postponed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House First Readers
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper