+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 265
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2021: House Vote #441 Supplemental Local Calendar #2
- Yeas: 154
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 6
March 31, 2021: House Vote #440 Agree Sen Sub
- Yeas: 158
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 6
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #362 MOTION TO TABLE
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #415 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 52
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2021: House Vote #103 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 154
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor