+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Act 264
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
- House Second Readers
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor