+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 41
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor